CA SCA8 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 1 and 4 of, and adding Section 4.5 to, Article XI thereof, relating to counties.
Title
Counties: board of supervisors: redistricting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA8 Mendoza Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA8 Mendoza (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA8 Mendoza (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on the inactive file. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Mendoza. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Mitchell. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2717.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Mendoza. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2717.) |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2216.) (August 27). |
2015-08-21 | Senate | Set for hearing August 27. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | August 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Set for hearing August 17. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1855.) (July 7). |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Set for hearing July 7. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1733.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Set for hearing July 1. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after June 11. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |