CA SCA6 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - June 23 hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 19 of Article IV thereof, relating to gambling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gambling: sports wagering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22SenateJune 23 hearing canceled at the request of author.
2020-06-18SenateSet for hearing June 23.
2020-06-17SenateJune 18 hearing canceled at the request of author.
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-04SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-03SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 3632.) (June 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-29SenateSet for hearing June 2.
2020-05-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2020-05-28SenateReferral to Com. on E. & C.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2019-07-10SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and E. & C.A.
2019-06-28SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after July 28.
2019-06-27SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback