CA SCA5 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 9 of Article IX thereof, relating to the University of California.
Title
University of California: regents: student members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA5 Glazer et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA5 Glazer et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2824.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Glazer. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Glazer. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2160.) (August 26). |
2021-07-05 | Senate | July 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Set for hearing July 5. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1691.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Set for hearing June 28. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1465.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after May 16. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |