CA SCA5 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 4 of, and by adding Section 4.5 to, Article XIII A thereof, by amending Section 2 of Article XIII C thereof, and by amending Section 3 of Article XIII D thereof, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation: school districts: parcel tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 983.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 847.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR.
2019-02-28SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback