CA SCA5 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Section 3.1 to Article XIII thereof, by adding Sections 2.5 and 8.8 to Article XIII A thereof, by adding Section 14 to Article XIII B thereof, and by adding Sections 8.6 and 8.7 to Article XVI thereof, relating to local government finance.
Title
Local government finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 26. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |