CA SCA5 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 4 of, and by adding Section 4.5 to, Article XIII A thereof, by amending Section 2 of Article XIII C thereof, and by amending Section 3 of Article XIII D thereof, relating to taxation.
Title
Taxation: educational entities: parcel tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-10 | Set for hearing June 21. | |
2011-06-06 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-05-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. (Corrected May 31.) | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing June 7. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 763.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-03-16 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |