CA SCA4 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Section 9.5 to, and adding and repealing Section 9.7 of, Article IX thereof, relating to the University of California.
Title
University of California: tuition and mandatory systemwide fees: out-of-state students: admission: student financial assistance.
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-15 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | July 15 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 6. Page 1950.) Reconsideration granted. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Set for hearing July 15. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 10. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |