CA SCA3 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 9 and 10 of, and adding Section 7.5 to, Article II thereof, and by amending Section 8 of Article IV thereof, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: initiatives and referenda.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-08-29 | Senate | Set for hearing September 1. |
2023-08-28 | Senate | August 28 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-08-24 | Senate | Set for hearing August 28. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1026.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |