CA SCA3 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 3 of Article I and Section 6 of Article XIII B thereof, relating to public information.
Title
Public information.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Dan Logue [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - SCA3 Leno Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Budget (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA3 Leno (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Budget (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA3 Leno (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-20 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3139.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1651.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Set for hearing June 25. Set for hearing June 25 in APPR. pending receipt. From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1536.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1536.) (June 25). |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on GOV. & F.) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1483.) Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on APPR.) suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1483.) |
2013-06-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected June 21.) |
2013-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 1421.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 937.) (May 15). |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |