CA SCA3 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 12 of Article IV thereof, relating to the Legislature.
Title
Legislature: Budget Bill: passage requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-02-09 | Set for hearing February 23. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sca_3&sess=1112&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_3_bill_20101206_introduced.html |