CA SCA3 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 1 of Article XIX B thereof, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation Investment Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing May 13. | |
2009-01-29 | To Coms. on REV. & TAX., E., R. & C.A. and APPR. | |
2008-12-02 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sca_3&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_3_bill_20081201_introduced.html |