CA SCA22 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Set for hearing May 22.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 22 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 4 of, and by adding Section 4.5 to, Article XIII A thereof, by amending Section 2 of Article XIII C thereof, and by amending Section 3 of Article XIII D thereof, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation: School districts: parcel tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2018-05-09SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-04-24SenateSet for hearing May 9.
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR.
2018-04-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after May 6.
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback