CA SCA2 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Sections 2.1, 2.2, and 2.3 to Article XIIIA thereof, relating to tax limitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Home Protection for Seniors, Severely Disabled, Families, and Victims of Wildfire or Natural Disasters Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA2 Allen (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2020-06-15AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-09-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-07-11SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2058.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-01SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-07-01SenateFrom inactive file on motion of Senator Allen.
2019-05-23SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Allen.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1109.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 983.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2019-04-17SenateApril 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-02SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-03-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-01-31SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback