CA SCA19 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 2 of Article XIII A thereof, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: base year value transfers: qualified veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Set for hearing August 16. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | May 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5061.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4996.) (May 9). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | May 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 7. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |