CA SCA16 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - April 4 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4534.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - April 4 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4534.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 9 of, and adding Section 8.7 to, Article IX thereof, relating to educational expenses.
Title
Educational expenses: education savings accounts: University of California admissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-04-2018]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4534.) Reconsideration granted. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |