CA SCA1 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-07 - Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-07 - Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Section 10 to Article III thereof, relating to state audits.
Title
State Auditor: duties.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and E. & C.A. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sca_1&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_1_bill_20121203_introduced.html |