CA SBX13 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2013-14 First Extraordinary Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2013-14 First Extraordinary Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 100501 and 100503 of, and to add and repeal Sections 100504.5 and 100504.6 of, the Government Code, to amend, repeal, and add Section 1366.6 of, and to add and repeal Section 1399.864 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend, repeal, and add Section 10112.3 of, and to add and repeal Section 10961 of, the Insurance Code, and to add and repeal Section 14005.70 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: bridge plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB3 Hernandez Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - SB3 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By PAN First Extraordinary Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB3 Hernandez (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - SB3 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By PAN First Extraordinary Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB3 Hernandez (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2013-14 First Extraordinary Session. | |
2013-07-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 86.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 161.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 48.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 42.) (April 8). |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 36.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 100501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100504.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 100504.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 100504.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1366.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1399.864 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10961 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.70 | New Code | See Bill Text |