CA SB995 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21180, 21181, 21183, 21185, 21189.1, and 21189.3 of, and to add Sections 21157.8, 21183.5, 21183.6, 21184.7, and 21187.5 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Environmental quality: Jobs and Economic Improvement Through Environmental Leadership Act of 2011: housing projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 995 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 995 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez Move Previous Question By CALDERON (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB995 Atkins et al (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - [06-18-2020] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 995 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez Move Previous Question By CALDERON (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB995 Atkins et al (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - [06-18-2020] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 5510.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 6). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 3849.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3768.) (June 18). |
2020-06-18 | Senate | June 18 hearing: Reconsideration granted. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3768.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3621.) (May 29). |
2020-05-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 29. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21157.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21183.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21183.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21184.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21187.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |