CA SB995 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66452.10.5 to the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing: condominium conversions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-03 | Set for hearing May 5. | |
2010-02-18 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-02-10 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_995&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_995_bill_20100209_introduced.html |