CA SB992 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9.7 (commencing with Section 4450) to Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 11833 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance use disorders.
Title
Substance use disorder counselors: Allied Behavioral Health Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Melendez [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, PUB. S., and JUD. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4450 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11833 | Amended Code | Citation Text |