CA SB992 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 784, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 784, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11834.02, 11834.26, and 11834.36 of, and to add Chapter 7.4 (commencing with Section 11833.05) to Part 2 of Division 10.5 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to alcohol and drug programs.
Title
Alcoholism or drug abuse recovery or treatment facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB992 Hernandez et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 992 Hernandez Consent Calendar Second Day By FRIEDMAN (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB992 Hernandez (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 992 Hernandez Consent Calendar Second Day By FRIEDMAN (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB992 Hernandez (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 784, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5688.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6516.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4403.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4301.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4655.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11833.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11834.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11834.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11834.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11834.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |