CA SB990 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8570.4 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Office of Emergency Services: State Emergency Plan: LGBTQ+ individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 23). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8570.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |