CA SB99 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 202, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 202, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65302 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
General plans: safety element: emergency evacuation routes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB99 Nielsen et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Assembly - SB 99 Nielsen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB99 Nielsen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Assembly - SB 99 Nielsen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB99 Nielsen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 202, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2133.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2627.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1059.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 845.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and G.O. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |