CA SB99 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 322, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 322, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18546, 18990, 18991, 18992, 18993, 19057.1, 19057.3, 19889, 19889.2, 19889.3, and 22879 of, to add Sections 19829.9840, 19829.9841, 19889.4, 22871.3, 22874.2, and 22944.5 to, and to repeal Sections 19057, 19057.2, and 19057.4 of, the Government Code, relating to state public employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State public employment.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 2)SB9 9 B.& F.R. (Leno) Con (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SB 99 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB99 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SB 99 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB99 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 322, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2768.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 9.) (September 11). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 3159.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 27. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 386.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to second reading. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time. |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 18546 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18990 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18991 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18992 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18993 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9840 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19829.9841 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19889 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19889.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19889.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19889.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22871.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22874.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22879 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22944.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |