CA SB99 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 164.56 and 2106 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 2100) of Division 3 of, to amend and repeal Sections 892.2, 892.4, 892.5, 892.6, 893, 893.2, 893.4, 893.6, 894, 894.2, and 2333.5 of, and to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 2380) to Division 3 of, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Active Transportation Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB99 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 99 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB99 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 99 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB99 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 2277.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 2969.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2848.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2013-08-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 899.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 164.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2333.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2380 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 892.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 892.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 892.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 892.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 893 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 893.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 893.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 893.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 894 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 894.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |