CA SB989 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 384 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State highways: relinquishment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB989 Wieckowski (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4876.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4769.) (April 23).
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-02-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code384Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback