CA SB988 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 225, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 225, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7196.2 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Home inspectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-09 - Assembly - SB 988 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB988 Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB988 Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 225, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 5. Page 6216.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (June 12). |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5007.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4496.) (April 2). |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7196.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |