CA SB981 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1485.5, 1485.55, and 4902 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: factual innocence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB981 Glazer et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SB 981 Glazer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB981 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SB 981 Glazer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB981 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4849.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5756.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3555.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1485.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1485.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |