CA SB980 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23985.5, 24013.2, and 24015 of, to add Section 23795 to, and to repeal Section 24013.1 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverage control.
Title
Alcoholic beverage licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3510.) (April 26). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23795 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23985.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 24013.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 24013.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 24015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |