CA SB980 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 56.18) to Part 2.6 of Division 1 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Privacy: genetic testing companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB980 Umberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 980 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB980 Umberg et al (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 980 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB980 Umberg et al (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2020-09-25 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5307.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | July 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 3864.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3768.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3583.) (May 22). |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on PUB. S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2020-04-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 56.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |