CA SB98 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 42238.026 of the Education Code, relating to education finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance: local control funding formula: enrollment-based funding report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB98 Portantino (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2024-05-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2023-07-10AssemblyJuly 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2023-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 1251.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1160.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-04-10SenateApril 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2023-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 450.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-02SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2023-01-25SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2023-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2023-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code42238.026Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback