CA SB98 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1627, 1630, 102247, 103605, 103625, and 127662 of, to add Section 1629.5 to, and to repeal and add Section 127665 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 5892 and 5899 of, and to add Sections 5892.1 and 5899.1 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB98 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 19. Page 2250.) |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1034.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 102247 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103625 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127662 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1629.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1630 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5892 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5892.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5899 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5899.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |