CA SB977 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19556 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horse racing: charity racing days: nonprofit corporation or trust: distributions to qualified disabled jockeys.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 977 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB977 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6310.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4764.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4366.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-02-22SenateSet for hearing March 13.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19556Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback