CA SB976 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - April 24 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 4817.)
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - April 24 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 4817.)
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 667.5 and 2933.5 of the Penal Code, relating to crime.
Title
Violent felonies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | April 24 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 4817.) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2933.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 667.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |