CA SB975 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53369.30, 53396, 53398.30, 53398.75, and 62005 of, and to add Article 18.5 (commencing with Section 53993) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of, the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Tax increment: property tax override rates.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] |
Sen. John Moorlach [R] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Assembly - SB 975 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB975 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB975 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5488.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3549.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3420.) (April 6). |
2016-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | March 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53369.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53396 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53993 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 62005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |