CA SB971 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - April 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4627.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - April 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4627.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 190.2 of the Penal Code, relating to murder.
Title
Murder: special circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - [04-10-2018] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4627.) Reconsideration granted. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 190.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 853.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |