CA SB962 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Set for hearing April 18.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 8 (commencing with Section 38600) to Division 25.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: replacement tires.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-03-21SenateRe-referred to Coms. on EQ. and T. & H.
2018-03-13SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-13SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-03-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-02-01SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code9094.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code38600New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback