CA SB959 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-27 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Zbur.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-27 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Zbur.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 119.6 (commencing with Section 150960) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to trans-inclusive care.
Title
Trans-inclusive care: resources and support services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB959 Menjivar et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB959 Menjivar et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-27 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Zbur. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4105.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3965.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3468.) (April 3). |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 150960 | New Code | See Bill Text |