CA SB959 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 234.7 of, and to add Section 8206.3 to, the Education Code, relating to educational equity.
Title
Educational equity: immigration and citizenship status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 234.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8206.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB959 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB959 |