CA SB959 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 5318 of the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation: provider reimbursement:
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB959 Lieu (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB959 Lieu (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2012-08-23 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2012-06-25 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Allen. | |
2012-06-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 3640.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3460.) (May 9). | |
2012-05-03 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2012-03-26 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2012-03-22 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-01-11 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66602.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 89517.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 5318 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |