CA SB957 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1170 of the Penal Code, relating to imprisonment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Imprisonment: state prison.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3310.) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |