CA SB955 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1294, 1296, 14501, 44662, 44929.21, 44936, 44944, 44945, 44955, and 44956 of, to amend and repeal Section 44660 of, to add Sections 44660.5, 44955.1, and 44955.2 to, and to repeal Section 44949 of, the Education Code, relating to school districts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
School districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-06-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-04-29 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 4. Page 3294.) | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-18 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-05 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 7. | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |