CA SB951 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 38.9 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxes: credits: motion pictures: Legislative Analyst’s Office report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB951 Mitchell et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2018-08-08AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 6).
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-06-11AssemblyJune 19 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and REV. & TAX.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4446.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4300.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4721.) (April 18).
2018-04-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-01-31SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback