CA SB951 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 4 (commencing with Section 75240) of Division 44 of the Public Resources Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: Golden State Patriot Passes Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3642.) (April 20). |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3336.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39719 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 22350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 75240 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |