CA SB951 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 866, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 866, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10112.27 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: essential health benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB951 Hernandez Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - SB 951 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By MONNING (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-24 - Assembly - SB 951 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By MONNING Amend By MONNING Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB951 Hernandez (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - SB 951 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By MONNING (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-24 - Assembly - SB 951 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By MONNING Amend By MONNING Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB951 Hernandez (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 866, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4979.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-28 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6451.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6259.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-05-07 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-07 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3427.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-02 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-01 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3387.) (April 30). | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-16 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3142.) (April 11). | |
2012-03-30 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2012-03-29 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-03-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-01-06 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. | |
2012-01-05 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |