CA SB950 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 509, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 509, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1035.7 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans' homes: accounting for charges: written
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB950 Wiggins (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 950 Wiggins Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB950 Wiggins (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 950 Wiggins Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB950 Wiggins (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 509, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-19 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4646.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-12 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6177.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.) | |
2010-06-29 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |
2010-06-16 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |
2010-05-28 | To Coms. on V.A. and JUD. | |
2010-05-10 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3480.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-05 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-04 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-22 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3304.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-15 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3187.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-02-23 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2010-02-18 | To Coms. on V.A. and JUD. | |
2010-02-05 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 7. | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |