CA SB95 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-19 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-19 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17267, 17300, 17301, 17319, 81133, and 81133.1 of the Education Code, to amend Section 17202 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 905.2, 3515.7, 14659.10, 16304, 16304.1, 30035.5, and 99010 of, to add Sections 210.6, 1044, 8880.43, and 16401.5 to, to add Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 14985) to Part 5.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Chapter 3.7 (commencing with Section 8299) of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 50676 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 11105 of the Penal Code, to amend Section 10187.5 of the Public Contract Code, to add Section 18874 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Section 1973 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, to repeal Section 15 of Chapter 6 of the Statutes of 2017, and to repeal Section 9 of Chapter 7 of the Statutes of 2017, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB95 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 2161.) |
2017-06-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1033.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |