CA SB948 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 85317 and 85318 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: contribution limitations.
Sponsors
Asm. Rick Zbur [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - Senate - Special Consent SB948 Limón et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - SB 948 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB948 Limón et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - SB 948 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB948 Limón et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-07-02 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4828.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-06-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5993.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3872.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3810.) (April 30). |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 85317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85318 | Amended Code | Citation Text |