CA SB940 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 69433.6 and 69435.3 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student financial aid: Cal Grant Program: foster youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB940 Beall et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26AssemblyJune 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4345.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4299.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-16SenateApril 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4375.) (March 14).
2018-03-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-27SenateSet for hearing March 14.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-01-30SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code69433.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69434Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69435.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback