CA SB94 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6254, 8280, 8281, 8282, 8283, 8284, 8286, 8287, 8288, 8291, 8292, 8293, 8294, 8295, 8296, 13332.18, 15820.926, and 15820.946 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 12803, 12838, and 12838.1 of, to add Sections 8281.5 and 8290.5 to, and to add Article 1 (commencing with Section 12820) to Chapter 1 of Part 2.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 490.4, 786.5, 853.6, 978.5, 1001.82, 1210.6, 5075, 13520, 13526, 13526.1, 13526.2, 13526.3, and 13899.1 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 830.5 and 2816 of, and to add Sections 830.53, 2936, 5007.3, 11105.9, 13503.5, and 30012 to, the Penal Code, to amend Section 1095 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to amend Section 1700 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1703, 1710, 1711, 1712, 1714, 1731.5, and 1731.7 of, and to add and repeal Section 1752.2 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety: omnibus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 94 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB94 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB94 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-06-25SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-06-17SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1601.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-17SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2308.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.)
2019-06-17AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-17AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 669.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12803New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12838New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12838.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code13332.18Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15820.926Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15820.946Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6254Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8280Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8281Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8282Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8283Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8284Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8286Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8287Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8288Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8291Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8292Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8293Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8294Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8295Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8296Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1095Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1001.82Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1210.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code13520Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code13526Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code13526.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code13526.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code13526.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code13899.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code2816New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code490.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code5075Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code786.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code830.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code853.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code978.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1700Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1703New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1710New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1711New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1712New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1714New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1731.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1731.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback